Samuel Philbrick, et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-00773
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cvus-05295 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday May 21, 2020 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Seema Verma, Administrator, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor for Defendant - Appellant
New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Samuel Philbrick, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ian Ludders, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Karin Vlk, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joshua Vlk, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/21/2020 4:32 AM EDT |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 19-5295 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1813510] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00773-JEB filed by New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5295 19-5295 | ||
1 pgs LETTER [1813513] sent regarding attorney membership to Anthony J. Galdieri for New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services and Catherine A. McKee for Samuel Philbrick, Ian Ludders, Karin Vlk and Joshua Vlk in 19-5293 and 19-5295 Application for Admission due 12/02/2019. 19-5293 19-5295 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1813518] filed consolidating cases 19-5295 (Consolidation started 10/31/2019) with 19-5293 directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/16/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/02/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/02/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/02/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/16/2019 19-5293 19-5295 |