Township of Brick v. Purdue Pharma, Inc., et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45924 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2019 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-17998 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:37 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-50
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Township of Brick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 11:37 AM EST |
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |