Jones v. Johnson et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie L White |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-03058 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 04, 2020 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jacita Crawford
|
|
Defendant
Earlyne McCallister Thomas
|
|
Defendant
Gena Stringer
|
|
Defendant
Sharmara Stephens
|
|
Defendant
St. Louis City Children's Divison
|
|
Defendant
Emily Rinehart
|
|
Defendant
James W. Muehleisen
|
|
Defendant
Kate Kersting-Audrain
|
|
Defendant
Jesse Johnson
|
|
Defendant
James Davis Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Grace Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer Humphrey
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan Hamilton
|
|
Defendant
Keith A. Dockins
|
|
Defendant
Jamil Davis
|
|
Defendant
Danis Pediatric Center
|
|
Defendant
Teresa Brown
|
|
Plaintiff
Karen Jones
P.O. Box 4823
St. Louis, MO 63108 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 02/06 2:47 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/6/2020. (TMT) |
|
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 02/06 2:45 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No.2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because the Court lacks jurisdiction over this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel and motion to appoint next friend are DENIED as moot. [ECF Nos.3 and4 ] An appropriate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/6/2020. (TMT) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 02/06 2:48 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5, 6. Thu Feb 6 14:48:21 CST 2020 (Tillman, Tiffani) |
||
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 11/07 11:26 AM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Thu 11/07 11:27 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Thu 11/07 12:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Nov 7 12:01:20 CST 2019 (admin,) |
||
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appointment of Next Friend
Thu 11/07 11:13 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to by Plaintiff Karen Jones. (MFG) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 11/07 11:09 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Karen Jones. (MFG) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 11/07 11:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Karen Jones. (MFG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/07 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Karen Jones.(MFG) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form |