Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Referred: Robert M Spector
Case #: 3:19-cv-01773
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2019
Terminated:Feb 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2020 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Elzbieta Darmoros
Represented By
Robert J. Kor
contact info
Phyllis M. Pari
Letizia, Ambrose & Falls, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Euro Homecare LLC
Represented By
Robert J. Kor
contact info
Phyllis M. Pari
Letizia, Ambrose & Falls, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Drelichowski
Represented By
Mariusz Kurzyna
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Drwiega
Represented By
Mariusz Kurzyna
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Gorzkowska
Represented By
Mariusz Kurzyna
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrycja Martinez
Represented By
Mariusz Kurzyna
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 22 2021
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Certify Class; denying as moot 25 Motion to Certify Class. For the reasons outlined in the attached Ruling and Order, Plaintiffs' motion to certify class is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' amended motion is denied as moot. The Court orders the parties to confer and revise the notice and consent form consistent with this Order and submit a final version for the Court's approval by February 5, 2021. The Court further orders Defendants to disclose to Plaintiffs counsel the names, dates of employment, last known home addresses, e-mail addresses, and telephone numbers of Euro Homecare employees within the proposed opt-in plaintiff class by February 22, 2021.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/22/2021. (Shaffer, Chelsea)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Tue 02/28 10:17 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Murphy, Tatihana)
Related: [-]