Coosa County, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45995 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Middle, 2:19-cv-00752 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2019 4:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Coosa County, Alabama
The Coosa County Commission P.O. Box 218
Rockford, AL 35136 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/18/2019 4:08 PM EST |
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coosa County, Alabama. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc1 for PDF) (amf, ) [Transferred from almd on 11/12/2019.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 11/12/2019.] | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |