MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES v. SHI
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-20098 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2020 4:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
PARKER SHI
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV RICHARD FRIEDMAN
|
|
Plaintiff
MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/05/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
48 | 48
2
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order Order of Dismissal
Wed 02/24 9:07 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/23/2021. (jem) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 02/22 5:15 PM
Proposed Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES re46 Stipulation and Order, Permanent Injunction.(ORLANDO, JASON) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
46 | 46
11
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order Permanent Injunction
Fri 02/19 3:58 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/19/2021. (jem) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 02/18 7:40 PM
Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES.(ORLANDO, JASON) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Oral Motion
Mon 02/08 10:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: The requirements of DE 43 are stayed. A status update regarding settlement discussion is to be submitted by 3/31/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni (mm) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order
Tue 12/22 12:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: A Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding Data Return and Remediation is to be submitted by 1/26/21; proposal regarding discovery is also to be submitted by 1/26/21. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/22/2020. (eh, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 12/22 12:12 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 12/22/2020. (eh, ) |
||
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Oral Motion
Thu 12/17 4:21 PM
TEXT ORDER: Status Conference via telephone set for December 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) (mm) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
6
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/24 4:04 PM
LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff McKinsey in pursuing requested discovery did not unreasonably impose an undue burden or expense on Accenture; The court shall not impose any sanction here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/24/2020. (mg) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Letter
Thu 10/29 6:34 PM
Letter from Richard Friedman, Esq.. (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Transcript
Mon 10/19 3:15 PM
Transcript of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING DISCOVERY held on 10/14/2020, before Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Court Reporter TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2021. (km) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 10/14 3:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 10/14/2020. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 9/23/2020, with a written status update. (Digitally Recorded) (mm) (Main Document 38 replaced on 10/14/2020) (mm) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 10/13 10:06 AM
Letter from Richard B. Friedman, Esq.. (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Oral Motion
Wed 10/07 11:30 AM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for October 13, 2020, is hereby RESCHEDULED to October 14, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Dial-in information shall be provided by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Oral Motion
Tue 09/29 2:16 PM
TEXT ORDER: Status Conference via telephone set for October 13, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Dial-in information shall be provided by the Court. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter
Mon 09/14 8:25 PM
Letter from Richard B. Friedman, Esq.. (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/09 1:13 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Zachary W. Klinger, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/09/2020. (jem) |
|
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/09 1:11 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven M. Kayman, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/09/2020. (jem) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/17 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES.(BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of John W. Bartlett, Esq. in Support of Zachary W. Klinger, Esq.'s Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Zachary W. Klinger, Esq. in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/17 1:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES.(BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of John W. Bartlett, Esq. in Support of Steven M. Kayman, Esq.'s Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Steven M. Kayman, Esq. in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/17 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. CLEARY on behalf of MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES (CLEARY, ROBERT) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/17 2:19 PM
Set Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ,31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) |
||
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Oral Motion
Mon 08/03 8:22 AM
TEXT ORDER- The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 9/15/2020 with a written status update. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Oral Motion
Fri 05/29 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER- The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 7/31/2020, with a written status update. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 04/15 11:28 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 4/15/2020. In light of the pandemic, the parties will continue with document/interrogatory discovery as able. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 5/29/2020, with a written status update. The schedule shall be adjusted as appropriate. (mm) |
||
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/11 2:19 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 3/11/2020. Status Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Plaintiff is to initiate the call. (mm) |
||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/28 3:54 PM
ORDER extending the expedited discovery until 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/28/2020. (jem) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Oral Motion
Tue 02/25 2:40 PM
TEXT ORDER - Telephone Conference set for March 3, 2020, is hereby RESCHEDULED to March 11, 2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be plaintiff's responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference, as well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/22 4:16 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 1/22/2020. Fact discovery to be completed by 3/5/2020. Status Telephone Conference set for 3/3/2020 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Plaintiff is to initiate the call. (mm) |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/15 2:39 PM
Verified ANSWER to Complaint by PARKER SHI.(SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 01/13 10:24 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Verified Complaint is extended to 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/13/2020. (jem) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/10 6:49 PM
STIPULATION by PARKER SHI. (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Mon 12/09 3:20 PM
Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/09/2019. (jem) |
|
20 | 20
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 12/09 9:01 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendant Parker Shi to answer, move, or otherwise to the Verified Complaint is extended to 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/09/2019. (jem) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 12/06 5:02 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel requesting entry of Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order.(BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order) | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/06 1:12 PM
STIPULATION between Counsel by PARKER SHI. (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
7
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/04 9:00 AM
ORDER FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: Plaintiff shall initiate a Telephone Conference on 1/22/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/03/2019. (jem) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 11/27 1:50 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/27/2019. (km) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 11/27 10:02 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Richard B. Friedman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10143208.) (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 11/27 3:34 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, RICHARD FRIEDMAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km) |
||
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 11/26 6:09 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel requesting entry of proposed Orders.(BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Consent Order for Expedited Discovery), | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Stipulation & Consent Injunction) | ||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/22 4:48 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension until Tuesday, 11/26/2019 to submit a joint proposed scheduling order, or separate proposed Orders. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/22/2019. (jmh) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 11/22 4:20 PM
Letter from Plaintiff, with consent of Defendant, requesting extension re8 Memorandum,,, Order,,. (ORLANDO, JASON) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 11/21 12:11 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard B. Friedman, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/21/2019. (jem) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/18 6:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (filed by Local Counsel) by PARKER SHI.(SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard B. Friedman, Esq. | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/18 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL JANE SCHULMAN on behalf of All Defendants (SCHULMAN, RACHEL) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/18 9:06 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (filed by Local Counsel) . Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) |
||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Memorandum Order
Mon 11/18 7:53 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of an Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints and for Expedited Discovery1 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties must submit a joint proposed scheduling order to the Honorable Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J. by 11/22/2019. If the parties are unable to agree to a joint proposed scheduling order, the parties must submit separate proposed scheduling orders by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/15/2019. (jem) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/15 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER D. ZINGARO on behalf of All Plaintiffs ( ZINGARO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 11/15 12:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint, Proposed Order To Show Cause, Memorandum of Law, Declarations of S. Van Kuiken, D. Triantopoulos, and J. Hotzler, Summons, and Certif. of Service served on Rachel Lee, co-tenant of Parker Shi on 11/14/2019, filed by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES. (BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Thu 11/14 6:03 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel. (BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/13 10:10 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PARKER SHI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/12 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JASON F. ORLANDO on behalf of MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES (ORLANDO, JASON) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Tue 11/12 3:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES identifying McKinsey & Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/12 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against PARKER SHI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10103889) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES.(BARTLETT, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order To Show Cause with Temporary Restraints & Expedited Discovery), | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration (Declaration of Steven Van Kuiken), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit (Ex. A to Decl. of S. Van Kuiken), | ||
Att: 5 Declaration (Declaration of Dimitris Triantopoulos), | ||
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit (Ex. A to Decl. of D. Triantopoulos), | ||
Att: 7 Declaration (Declaration of Jason Hotzler), | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 11/13 10:06 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg) |