Shaw v. Custom Air Products and Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01054 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Custom Air Products and Services, Inc.
35 Southbelt Industrial Drive
Houston, TX 77047 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
633 Chestnut St. Ste. 1900
Chattanooga, TN 37450 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/16 12:42 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1054 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 04/16 12:41 PM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1054. (cfy) |
||
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 04/04 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Cancelled
Wed 04/01 2:40 PM
Hearing Cancelled (cfy) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 04/01 2:39 PM
Order Re: . The show cause hearing scheduled for April 16, 2020 is canceled. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Tue 03/31 3:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing Held/Continued (BK)
Thu 03/19 3:16 PM
Hearing Held/Continued Hearing scheduled 04/16/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN (sal) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
Hearing Held/Continued (Adv)
Thu 02/27 2:47 PM
Hearing Held/Continued Hearing scheduled 03/19/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN (sal) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 02/07 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Show Cause
Tue 02/04 11:03 AM
Order for counsel to the plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause why this proceeding should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute . Show Cause Hearing to be held on 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (generic)
Tue 12/10 8:49 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Defendant Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/10 8:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Custom Air Products and Services, Inc. 12/4/2019 (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 12/02 3:43 PM
Summons Issued on Custom Air Products and Services, Inc. Date Issued 12/2/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 11/27 2:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01054-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20117554. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 11/27 1:54 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Custom Air Products and Services, Inc. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/27 1:53 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01054. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw against Custom Air Products and Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |