Shaw v. Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01056 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
34 N. Meramec Ave.
Clayton, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
633 Chestnut St. Ste. 1900
Chattanooga, TN 37450 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/23 9:15 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1056 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 03/23 9:13 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1056. (cfy) |
||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/29 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/28/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/27 6:32 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Striking
Wed 02/26 3:52 PM
Order Striking Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice . (mnj) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Wed 02/26 11:19 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
court
Hearing Cancelled
Wed 02/05 10:46 AM
Hearing Cancelled Agreed Order to be submitted. (sal) |
||
Sunday, January 05, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 01/06 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/03 10:24 AM
Scheduling Order . Telephonic Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 01:00 PM with Judge Whittenburg. Written Report due by 2/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/02 2:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by James R. Moore on behalf of Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Moore, James) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 12/16 6:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James R. Moore on behalf of Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Moore, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (generic)
Tue 12/10 8:52 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Defendant Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/10 8:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on Graybar Electric Company, Inc. 12/4/2019 (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 12/02 3:44 PM
Summons Issued on Graybar Electric Company, Inc. Date Issued 12/2/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 11/27 2:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01056-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20117554. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 11/27 2:03 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/27 2:02 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01056. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw against Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |