Shaw v. PPG Industries, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01057 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
PPG Industries, Inc.
1 PPG Pl.
Pittsburgh, PA 15272 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
633 Chestnut St. Ste. 1900
Chattanooga, TN 37450 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/25 9:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1057 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 02/25 9:09 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1057. (cfy) |
||
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 02/07 11:41 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 01/10 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Agreed Order
Tue 01/07 2:55 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cam) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Agreed Order
Mon 01/06 2:23 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Seeking Deadline Extension Filed by Ronald B. Roteman on behalf of Defendant PPG Industries, Inc. (Roteman, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/30 11:51 AM
Agreed Stipulation Extending the Deadline to Answer or Respond to the Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by Ronald B. Roteman on behalf of Defendant PPG Industries, Inc.. (Roteman, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 12/20 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/19/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 12/17 4:06 PM
Order Granting Motion for Ronald B. Roteman To Appear pro hac vice The word "case" in the second line on page 2 is changed to "adversary proceeding." (cfy) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order (Tendered)
Mon 12/16 10:53 AM
Tendered proposed order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald B. Roteman Filed by Ronald B. Roteman on behalf of Defendant PPG Industries, Inc. . (Roteman, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/10 4:12 PM
Certificate of Service on Ronald B. Roteman, Esq. Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw . (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (generic)
Tue 12/10 8:55 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Defendant Filed by Justin M. Sveadas on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/10 8:54 AM
Summons Service Executed on PPG Industries, Inc. 12/4/2019 (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 12/04 2:27 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Ronald B. Roteman on behalf of Defendant PPG Industries, Inc. (Roteman, Ronald) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 12/02 3:45 PM
Summons Issued on PPG Industries, Inc. Date Issued 12/2/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 11/27 2:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01057-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20117554. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 11/27 2:07 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant PPG Industries, Inc. (Sveadas, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/27 2:06 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01057. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw against PPG Industries, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Sveadas, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Case Cover Sheet |