Shaw, Plan Administrator v. ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01060 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc.
110 Sargent Drive
New Haven, CT 06511 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/09 12:42 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1060 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 03/09 12:41 PM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1060. (cfy) |
||
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Thu 02/20 10:16 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/01 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Agreed Order
Wed 01/29 12:35 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Agreed Order
Tue 01/28 12:06 PM
Second Motion For Agreed Order Further Extending Time for Defendant ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 01/11 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Agreed Order
Wed 01/08 10:59 AM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Agreed Order
Tue 01/07 12:52 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 12/19 1:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc. 12/10/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/03 1:35 PM
Summons Issued on ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc. Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Tue 12/03 11:30 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 12/03 11:27 AM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01060-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20127714. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/03 11:26 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01060. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against ASSA Abloy Service Centers, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |