Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Custom Controls Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01061 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Custom Controls Company
5712 Yale Street
Houston, TX 77076 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/06 8:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1061 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 07/06 8:58 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1061. (cfy) |
||
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/01 2:25 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding re Custom Controls Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/22 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/21/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Discovery/Written Report
Wed 02/19 4:02 PM
Discovery/Written Report Filed by Damian W. Abreo on behalf of Defendant Custom Controls Company. (Abreo, Damian) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/19 2:53 PM
Scheduling Order . Defendant Brief due by 11/10/2020. Plaintiff Brief due by 11/10/2020. Plaintiff Witness List due by 11/10/2020. Defendant Witness List due by 11/10/2020. Plaintiff Exhibit List due by 11/10/2020. Defendant Exhibit List due by 11/10/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. Trial date set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Discovery Rule 7026
Wed 02/05 4:24 PM
General Discovery Governing Rule 7026 Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Sunday, January 19, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 01/20 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 01/20 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, January 18, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 01/19 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 01/17 10:32 AM
Order Granting Motion for Donald W. Gould, II To Appear pro hac vice to represent the interests of Custom Controls Company (cfy) |
|
10 | 10
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 01/17 10:28 AM
Order Granting Motion for Damian W. Abreo To Appear pro hac vice in the interests of Custom Controls Company (cfy) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/16 1:23 PM
Scheduling Order . Telephonic Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 11:00 AM with Judge Whittenburg. Written Report due by 2/18/2020. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 01/15 3:46 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Damian W. Abreo on behalf of Defendant Custom Controls Company (Abreo, Damian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Damian W. Abreo in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 01/15 3:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Donald W. Gould on behalf of Defendant Custom Controls Company (Gould, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Donald W. Gould, II in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Order Admitting Donald W. Gould, II Pro Hac Vice | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/15 3:29 PM
Answer to Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Filed by Donald W. Gould on behalf of Defendant Custom Controls Company. (Gould, Donald) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 12/13 12:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Custom Controls Company 12/12/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/03 1:36 PM
Summons Issued on Custom Controls Company. Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Tue 12/03 11:40 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Custom Controls Company (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 12/03 11:39 AM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01061-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20127840. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/03 11:38 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01061. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Custom Controls Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |