Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Rexel USA, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01063 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Rexel USA, Inc.
14951 Dalla Parkway
Dallas, TX 75254 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 06/02 10:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1063 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 06/02 10:15 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1063. (cfy) |
||
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Mon 05/18 11:30 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 04/04 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Agreed Order
Wed 04/01 11:32 AM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Agreed Order
Wed 04/01 8:47 AM
Third Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant Rexel USA, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 03/20 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Agreed Order
Tue 03/17 1:28 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Agreed Order
Tue 03/17 9:21 AM
Second Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant Rexel USA, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 02/28 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/27/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Cancelled
Tue 02/25 11:09 AM
Hearing Cancelled (cfy) |
|
12 | 12
order
Agreed Order
Tue 02/25 11:07 AM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order The court cancels the show cause hearing scheduled for February 27, 2020. (cfy) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Agreed Order
Mon 02/24 4:56 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant Rexel USA, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, February 16, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 02/17 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 02/14 8:18 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default (tde) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Request for Entry of Default
Thu 02/13 1:44 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Rexel USA, Inc.. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Ryan Burgett in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default by Clerk | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Entry of Default by Clerk | ||
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 02/07 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Show Cause
Tue 02/04 10:59 AM
Order for counsel for the plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause why this proceeding should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute . Show Cause Hearing to be held on 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 12/26 3:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Rexel USA, Inc. 12/9/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/03 1:37 PM
Summons Issued on Rexel USA, Inc. Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Tue 12/03 11:55 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Rexel USA, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 12/03 11:55 AM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01063-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20127949. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/03 11:53 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01063. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Rexel USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |