Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01066 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc.
1100 Hawthorne Lane
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/19 8:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1066 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 02/19 8:25 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1066. (cfy) |
||
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 01/31 1:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Saturday, January 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 01/05 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Agreed Order
Thu 01/02 12:54 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Agreed Order
Tue 12/31 3:30 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Granting Motion for Agreed Order Extending Time For Defendant Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 12/23 12:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc. 12/13/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/03 1:39 PM
Summons Issued on Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc. Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Tue 12/03 12:21 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 12/03 12:17 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01066-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20128206. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/03 12:17 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01066. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |