Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Service Partners, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01067 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Service Partners, LLC
475 N Williamson Blvd.
Daytona Beach, FL 32114 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/08 9:28 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1067 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 05/08 9:27 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1067. (cfy) |
||
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/23 10:13 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 02/13 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/10 1:55 PM
Scheduling Order . Defendant Brief due by 10/21/2020. Plaintiff Brief due by 10/21/2020. Plaintiff Witness List due by 10/21/2020. Defendant Witness List due by 10/21/2020. Plaintiff Exhibit List due by 10/21/2020. Defendant Exhibit List due by 10/21/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. Trial date set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Hearing Held (BK)
Wed 02/05 11:50 AM
Hearing Held (sal) |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Discovery Rule 7026
Thu 01/30 4:51 PM
General Discovery Governing Rule 7026 Filed by Caleb Thomas Holzaepfel on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Holzaepfel, Caleb) |
|
Saturday, January 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 01/05 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/02 1:00 PM
Scheduling Order . Telephonic Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 11:00 AM with Judge Whittenburg. Written Report due by 2/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/31 1:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Vic L. McConnell on behalf of Defendant Service Partners, LLC. (McConnell, Vic) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Amended Document
Fri 12/13 11:00 AM
Amended Document Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 12/12 4:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on Service Partners, LLC 12/9/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/03 1:40 PM
Summons Issued on Service Partners, LLC . Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Tue 12/03 12:28 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Service Partners, LLC (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 12/03 12:27 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01067-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20128312. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/03 12:26 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01067. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Service Partners, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |