Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-07857
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2019
Case in other court:New Jersey, 3:19-cv-19582
Last checked: Saturday May 30, 2020 4:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
Brian D. Rosenblatt
Represented By
ROBERT MICHAEL SILVERMAN
Weitz & Luxenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/07 12:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 07/07 12:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 07/07 12:25 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 12/03 2:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-19582. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 12/03 3:34 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of New Jersey, 19-19582 Rosenblatt, opened in California Northern District as 19-07857 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 168 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
4 4 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-168) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
3 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRIAN D. ROSENBLATT. MONSANTO COMPANY served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (SILVERMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
Related: [-]
Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10073629) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Brian D. Rosenblatt.(SILVERMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet