Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Dynamic Security, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01074 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dynamic Security, Inc.
1102 Woodward Avenue
Muscle Shoals, AL 35661 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/07 3:50 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1074 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 05/07 3:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1074. (cfy) |
||
Saturday, April 25, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 04/26 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/25/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
court
Hearing Cancelled
Thu 04/23 10:09 AM
Hearing Cancelled (cfy) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 04/23 10:08 AM
Order Re: The show cause hearing scheduled for May 7, 2020 is canceled . (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/22 3:45 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Sunday, April 12, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 04/13 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Show Cause
Fri 04/10 10:46 AM
Order for counsel for the parties to Appear and Show Cause why the joint stipulation of dismissal has not been submitted . Show Cause Hearing to be held on 5/7/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
Hearing Held (BK)
Tue 03/10 11:14 AM
Hearing Held Joint stipulation of dismissal to be submitted. (sal) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
utility
Discovery Rule 7026
Mon 03/09 9:03 AM
General Discovery Governing Rule 7026 Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 02/13 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/10 12:37 PM
Scheduling Order . Telephonic Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM with Judge Whittenburg. Written Report due by 3/6/2020. (cfy) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/07 11:52 AM
Answer to Complaint Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc.'s Answer to the First Amended Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 Filed by Paul Maxwell Smith on behalf of Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc.. (Smith, Paul) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/01 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/29 12:40 PM
Order Denying Motion as Moot to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding The motion is denied as moot, the plaintiff having filed an amended complaint. (cfy) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/24 3:34 PM
Amended Complaint by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Dynamic Security, Inc.. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 01/10 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Tue 01/07 4:30 PM
Brief/Memorandum Filed by Paul Maxwell Smith on behalf of Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc. . (Smith, Paul) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/07 4:28 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Paul Maxwell Smith on behalf of Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc. Objections due by 01/28/2020. (Smith, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/07 2:51 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. The motion is denied without prejudice because it does not comply with E.D. Tenn. LBR 7007-1(c). (cam) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Fri 01/03 3:24 PM
Brief/Memorandum Filed by Paul Maxwell Smith on behalf of Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc. . (Smith, Paul) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/03 3:22 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Paul Maxwell Smith on behalf of Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc. Objections due by 01/24/2020. (Smith, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Amended Document
Fri 12/13 10:59 AM
Amended Document Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 12/12 4:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dynamic Security, Inc. 12/9/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/04 1:08 PM
Summons Issued on Dynamic Security, Inc. Date Issued 12/4/2019, Answer Due 1/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 12/04 11:46 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Dynamic Security, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 12/04 11:45 AM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01074-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20132772. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/04 11:44 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01074. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Dynamic Security, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |