Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Elliott Electric Supply, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01075 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Elliott Electric Supply, Inc.
2526 North Stallings Drive
Nacogdoches, TX 75964 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 05/04 9:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1075 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 05/04 9:16 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1075. (cfy) |
||
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/16 10:06 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 03/13 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
utility
Discovery Rule 7026
Tue 03/10 4:50 PM
General Discovery Governing Rule 7026 Filed by Misti L. Beanland on behalf of Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, Inc.. (Beanland, Misti) |
|
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/10 3:26 PM
Scheduling Order . Defendant Brief due by 11/18/2020. Plaintiff Brief due by 11/18/2020. Plaintiff Witness List due by 11/18/2020. Defendant Witness List due by 11/18/2020. Plaintiff Exhibit List due by 11/18/2020. Defendant Exhibit List due by 11/18/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. Trial date set for 12/9/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Continued/Reset (Adv)
Fri 02/28 2:40 PM
Hearing Continued/Reset Hearing scheduled 03/10/2020 at 01:00 PM at by telephone with Judge Whittenburg (sal) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
utility
Discovery Rule 7026
Thu 02/27 2:30 PM
General Discovery Governing Rule 7026 Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/08 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/05 1:36 PM
Scheduling Order . Telephonic Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 01:00 PM with Judge Whittenburg. Written Report due by 3/2/2020. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/04 4:00 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Misti L. Beanland on behalf of Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, Inc.. (Beanland, Misti) |
|
Sunday, January 19, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 01/20 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 01/17 10:30 AM
Order Granting Motion for Misti L. Beanland To Appear pro hac vice to represent Elliott Electric Supply, Inc. (cfy) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 01/17 4:17 AM
Amended Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Misti L. Beanland on behalf of Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, Inc. (Beanland, Misti) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, January 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 01/12 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/11/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 01/09 9:15 AM
Order Denying without prejudice Motion To Appear pro hac vice (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 01/08 2:35 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Misti L. Beanland (cfy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order. | ||
Saturday, January 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 01/05 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Agreed Order
Thu 01/02 12:57 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Agreed Order
Mon 12/30 3:12 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Granting Motion for Order Extending Time for Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/17 10:47 AM
Summons Service Executed on Elliott Electric Supply, Inc. 12/12/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/04 1:09 PM
Summons Issued on Elliott Electric Supply, Inc. Date Issued 12/4/2019, Answer Due 1/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 12/04 11:50 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 12/04 11:50 AM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01075-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20132794. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/04 11:49 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01075. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Elliott Electric Supply, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |