Shaw, Plan Administrator v. ThyssenKrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01076 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ThyssenKrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC
1 ThyssenKrupp Drive
Calvert, AL 36513 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 06/16 8:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1076 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 06/16 8:03 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1076. (cfy) |
||
Thursday, May 28, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Thu 05/28 9:41 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 05/02 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Agreed Order
Wed 04/29 12:12 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Agreed Order
Wed 04/29 8:37 AM
Motion For Agreed Order Further Extending Time for Defendant ThyssenKrupp Materials NA, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Defendant Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/10 10:02 AM
Summons Service Executed on Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. 4/8/2020 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 04/04 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
court
Summons Issued
Thu 04/02 12:46 PM
Summons Issued on Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. Date Issued 4/2/2020, Answer Due 5/4/2020. (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 04/01 1:10 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/01 1:09 PM
Amended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR AVOIDANCE AND RECOVERY OF PREFERENTIAL TRANSFERS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550) by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc.. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
13 | 13
order
Amend
Wed 04/01 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion To Amend Complaint (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Amend
Tue 03/10 9:42 AM
Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 02/07 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Agreed Order
Tue 02/04 12:58 PM
Order Granting Second Motion For Agreed Order extending time for defendant to answer (cfy) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Agreed Order
Tue 02/04 9:32 AM
Second Motion For Agreed Order Further Extending Time for Defendant Thyssenkrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 01/10 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Agreed Order
Tue 01/07 2:53 PM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cam) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Agreed Order
Mon 01/06 2:36 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Granting Motion for Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant Thyssenkrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 01/06 2:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on ThyssenKrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC 12/11/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/04 1:09 PM
Summons Issued on ThyssenKrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC. Date Issued 12/4/2019, Answer Due 1/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 12/04 11:55 AM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant ThyssenKrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 12/04 11:54 AM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01076-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20132826. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/04 11:53 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01076. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against ThyssenKrupp Steel and Stainless USA, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |