Shaw, Plan Administrator v. TXU Energy Retail Company, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01079 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
TXU Energy Retail Company, LLC
6555 Sierra Drive
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/07 3:52 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1079 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 05/07 3:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1079. (cfy) |
||
Saturday, April 25, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 04/26 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Cancelled
Thu 04/23 10:12 AM
Hearing Cancelled (cfy) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 04/23 10:11 AM
Order Re: The show cause hearing scheduled for May 21, 2020 is canceled . (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 04/23 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/22/2020. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Wed 04/22 3:46 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Show Cause
Mon 04/20 11:53 AM
Order for counsel for the parties to Appear and Show Cause why this proceeding should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute . Show Cause Hearing to be held on 5/21/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 02/21 1:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/20/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Agreed Order
Tue 02/18 11:58 AM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order (cfy) |
|
Monday, February 17, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Agreed Order
Mon 02/17 11:14 AM
Third Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time to Answer Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/08 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Agreed Order
Wed 02/05 10:45 AM
Order Granting Second Motion For Agreed Order extending time to answer (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Agreed Order
Tue 02/04 4:15 PM
Second Motion For Agreed Order Further Extending Time for Defendant TXU Energy Retail Company LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 12/26 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Agreed Order
Mon 12/23 11:09 AM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant TXU Energy Retail Company LL to Answer the Complaint . Extended to February 3, 2020. (mnj) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Agreed Order
Fri 12/20 3:25 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant TXU Energy Retail Company LL to Answer the Complaint Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 12/16 11:23 AM
Summons Service Executed on TXU Energy Retail Company, LLC 12/10/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/04 1:11 PM
Summons Issued on TXU Energy Retail Company, LLC. Date Issued 12/4/2019, Answer Due 1/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 12/04 12:11 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant TXU Energy Retail Company, LLC (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 12/04 12:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01079-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20132903. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/04 12:09 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01079. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against TXU Energy Retail Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |