Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01080 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
1920 Westridge Drive
Irving, TX 75038 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/06 9:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1080 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 10/06 9:58 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1080. (cfy) |
||
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 09/19 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 09/16 8:53 AM
Order Re: The status conference scheduled for September 23, 2020, is canceled . (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/15 2:27 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 09/04 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 09/04 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/01 4:40 PM
Scheduling Order . Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone with Judge Whittenburg. (cfy) |
|
31 | 31
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 09/01 4:38 PM
Order Granting Motion Extending Rebuttal Expert Report Deadline (cfy) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Mon 08/31 4:19 PM
Motion to Extend Time To Extend Rebuttal Expert Report Deadline Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
court
Document
Mon 08/31 4:07 PM
Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw's Designation of Rebuttal Expert Witness Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Harold Schaeffer's CV | ||
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
court
Defendant Witness List
Mon 08/17 4:49 PM
Defendant Witness List Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 08/06 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Agreed Order
Mon 08/03 11:30 AM
Order Granting Motion For Agreed Order extending expert witness, discovery, and dispositive motion deadlines (cfy) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Agreed Order
Fri 07/31 3:41 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Extending Expert Witness, Discovery, and Dispositive Motion Deadlines Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
misc
Withdraw Document(s)
Fri 07/31 3:38 PM
Withdraw Documents(s) Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator . (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Agreed Order
Fri 07/31 3:11 PM
Motion For Agreed Order Extending Expert Witness, Discovery, and Dispositive Motion Deadlines Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
court
Defendant Witness List
Fri 07/17 4:55 PM
Defendant Witness List Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 02/07 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/04 1:02 PM
Scheduling Order . Defendant Brief due by 10/26/2020. Plaintiff Brief due by 10/26/2020. Plaintiff Witness List due by 10/26/2020. Defendant Witness List due by 10/26/2020. Plaintiff Exhibit List due by 10/26/2020. Defendant Exhibit List due by 10/26/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. Trial date set for 11/16/2020 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom B, Chattanooga, TN. (cfy) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing Held (BK)
Tue 02/04 11:40 AM
Hearing Held (sal) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
utility
Discovery Rule 7026
Fri 01/31 12:28 PM
General Discovery Governing Rule 7026 Filed by Ryan A. Burgett on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 01/30 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/29/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 01/27 1:17 PM
Order Granting Motion for Lisa M. Norman To Appear pro hac vice to represent Consolidate Electrical Distributors, Inc. (cfy) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Order (Tendered)
Fri 01/24 5:39 PM
Tendered proposed order Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. . (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 01/24 11:54 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate | ||
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 01/10 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 01/10 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/07 3:08 PM
Scheduling Order . Telephonic Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone with Judge Whittenburg. Written Report due by 1/31/2020. (cam) |
|
10 | 10
order
Amended Motion
Tue 01/07 3:02 PM
Order Granting Amended Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Patrick A. Kelley to represent Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (cam) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order (Tendered)
Mon 01/06 10:02 AM
Tendered proposed order Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/03 4:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Amended Motion
Fri 01/03 4:26 PM
Amended Motion Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate SDTX Good Standing | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 01/03 4:01 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Patrick Andrew Kelly on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Kelly, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate SDTX Good Standing | ||
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 12/12 4:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. 12/9/2019 (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/04 4:15 PM
Summons Issued on Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. Date Issued 12/4/2019, Answer Due 1/3/2020. (cfy) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 12/04 4:10 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Burgett, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 12/04 4:09 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01080-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20134591. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/04 4:08 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01080. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Burgett, Ryan) |