Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01081 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc 1 Cameron Hill Circle
Chattanooga, TN 37402 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator
Evans Harrison Hackett PLLC 835 Georgia Avenue, Suite 800
Chattanooga, TN 37402 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 09/01 8:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1081 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 09/01 8:49 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1081. (cfy) |
||
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 08/07 2:15 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Saturday, May 30, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 05/31 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/30/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Thu 05/28 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Wed 05/27 12:17 PM
Sixth Motion to Extend Time To for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 05/02 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Wed 04/29 12:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (cfy) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Wed 04/29 9:05 AM
Fifth Motion to Extend Time To Extension of Time for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 03/28 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/27/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Wed 03/25 10:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 03/24 4:24 PM
Fourth Motion to Extend Time To for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 02/29 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/28/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Wed 02/26 3:54 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time For Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading ; Extended through and including March 27, 2020. (mnj) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 02/25 4:44 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time To Extension of Time for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, February 08, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sun 02/09 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Thu 02/06 1:30 PM
Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Time (cfy) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Thu 02/06 10:14 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time To for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, January 12, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 01/13 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Fri 01/10 9:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 01/07 4:22 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time To for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 12/13 2:42 PM
Summons Service Executed on Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc. 12/11/2019 (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 12/06 9:30 AM
Summons Issued on Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc. Date Issued 12/6/2019. Answer Due 1/6/2020 (cam) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 12/05 3:24 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01081-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20139634. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Thu 12/05 2:32 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/05 2:29 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01081. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |