Shaw, Plan Administrator v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Co.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-15588
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01082 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Co.
1295 State Street
Springfield, MA 01111 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator
Evans Harrison Hackett PLLC 835 Georgia Avenue, Suite 800
Chattanooga, TN 37402 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/19 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1082 Closed. (cfy) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 02/19 8:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:19-ap-1082. (cfy) |
||
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 01/31 3:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Sunday, January 12, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 01/13 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 01/11 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Fri 01/10 9:59 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (cfy) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Rejected Order
Wed 01/08 3:48 PM
Attorney Scott M. Shaw Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator must tender an order to correct the deficiency noted on the rejected order. The corrected order shall be submitted through the Order Upload option. . The court rejects the proposed, uploaded order pursuant to E.D. Tenn. LBR 9013-1(c) & 9072-1(b) because it should not include a certificate of service. When the court signs a proposed, uploaded order, that order will be served with its own service date. Including a service date on a movant's proposed order invites possible confusion about the effective date of the order. (cfy) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 01/07 4:46 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time To for Defendant to file a Responsive Pleading Filed by Scott M. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator (Shaw, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 12/06 9:33 AM
Summons Issued on Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Co. Date Issued 12/6/2019. Answer Due 1/6/2020. (cam) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 12/05 3:24 PM
Receipt of Complaint(1:19-ap-01082-NWW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20139634. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Thu 12/05 3:07 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Co. (Shaw, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/05 3:05 PM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01082. Complaint by Scott M. Shaw, Plan Administrator against Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Co.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Shaw, Scott) |