Greer v. Elliott et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46117 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 3:19-cv-00260 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2019 1:44 PM EST |
Defendant
Charles Elliott, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marshall Hollis
|
|
Defendant
Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John Does #1-10
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Greer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/16/2019 1:42 PM EST |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re3 Corporate Statement; Please refile to include electronic signature of Samuel Gregory (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | ||
Saturday, November 23, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |