Hedrick v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46124 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:19-cv-00794 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2019 1:16 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Hedrick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/18/2019 1:15 PM EST |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |