Olvitt v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-03441 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 08, 2020 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dowdupont Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema France SA
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Olvitt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/06 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Farrell on behalf of Archroma U.S., Inc.(Farrell, Peter) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings. Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case AND SPREAD to applicable member cases , to which the document relates as listed on document ( to create attorney/party association in applicable member cases ), per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/13 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie B Dubis on behalf of Archroma US Inc, Archroma U.S., Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dubis, Melanie) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/11 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 11/03 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos.: granting 665 Motion for Adina D. Bingham to Withdraw as Attorney for Archroma US, Inc (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (54) in case 2:19-cv-01275-RMG; granting (54) in case 2:19-cv-01382-RMG; (30) in case 2:19-cv-03047-RMG; (14) in case 2:19-cv-03441-RMG) Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/3/2020.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG, 2:19-cv-03441-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice Other
Fri 09/25 10:08 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/22 5:37 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, The, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products, Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemicals, Inc., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, United Technologies Corporation. (sshe, ) |
|
24 | 24
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/22 10:57 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, The, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, United Technologies Corporation, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Archroma Management LLC, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products, Inc, Chemicals, Inc., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Nation Ford Chemical Company, filed by Richard Olvitt. Service due by 12/21/2020 (Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice Other
Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases . Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s) . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/02 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 08/17 12:38 PM
ORDER This filing relates to the following cases granting the Motion of Delia Frazier to Withdraw as Attorney for BASF Corporation ((754) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (59) in case 2:19-cv-01275-RMG; (59) in case 2:19-cv-01382-RMG; (35) in case 2:19-cv-03047-RMG; (19) in case 2:19-cv-03441-RMG; (29) in case 2:19-cv-03502-RMG; (29) in case 2:19-cv-03559-RMG; (17) in case 2:20-cv-00247-RMG; (21) in case 2:20-cv-00422-RMG; (24) in case 2:20-cv-00572-RMG; (45) in case 2:20-cv-00797-RMG; (14) in case 2:20-cv-00887-RMG; (17) in case 2:20-cv-01477-RMG; (16) in case 2:20-cv-01478-RMG; (19) in case 2:20-cv-01708-RMG; (26) in case 2:20-cv-01761-RMG; (21) in case 2:20-cv-01882-RMG; (13) in case 2:20-cv-02154-RMG). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/17/2020.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/13 6:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/22 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R Wellschlager on behalf of BASF Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Wellschlager, John) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/19 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Delia G Frazier on behalf of BASF Corporation (Frazier, Delia) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 06/15 5:11 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Archroma US Inc, Archroma U.S., Inc.. Response to Motion due by 6/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG, 2:19-cv-03441-RMG(Bingham, Adina) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/12 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E Raynal, IV on behalf of Archroma US Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Raynal, Charles) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/12 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Jordan on behalf of Archroma US Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Jordan, Robert) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/12 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D Weber on behalf of Archroma US Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Weber, Steven) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/23 5:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Olvitt(Cunningham, Merritt) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Tue 02/04 1:16 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only . Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/31 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adina D Bingham on behalf of Archroma US Inc, Archroma U.S., Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG, 2:19-cv-03441-RMG(Bingham, Adina) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/28 5:23 PM
General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to1 Complaint by BASF Corporation.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Other
Thu 01/02 2:57 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2: 20 -av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheets need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Counsel may e-file, as an attachment to the complaint or Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Other
Wed 12/18 11:30 AM
NOTICE ADDENDUM TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In addition to counsel preparing and submitting all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov, please include the master MDL docket entry number of the motion filed (and spread to applicable member case(s)) in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG to which the proposed order relates. Please reference within the proposed order in Word document format as well as the subject line of the email to chambers. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice Other
Wed 12/18 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE regarding Counsel should prepare and submit all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 12/11 4:01 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) Olvitt v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-3441-RMG Plaintiff state of residence: Maryland. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 12/13/2019 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/11 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/11 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8822157.), filed by Richard Olvitt. Service due by 3/10/2020(sshe, ) |