Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Charles Goodwin
Case #: 5:19-cv-01178
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 17, 2020 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Elara Caring LLC
Represented By
Lauren B Hanna
contact info
Michael A Birrer
Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal
contact info
Chelsea G Glover
Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal
contact info
Plaintiff
Brooke Madden
Represented By
Jamie M Caves
Park Nelson Caywood Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/08 2:45 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Exhibit to Settlement - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Elara Caring LLC. (Birrer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
28 28 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/05 9:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days; Motions to amend due within 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 02/21/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 03/08/2022; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 03/08/2022; Dft exhibit list due 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 06/13/2022; Jury instructions due 06/13/2022; Voir dire requests due 06/13/2022; Trial briefs due 06/13/2022; Discovery due by 5/2/2022. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Judge Charles Goodwin. Motions due by 4/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 6/13/2022. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 11/05/2021. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
27 27 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Tue 09/21 2:27 PM
ORDER denying22 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. This ruling, however, is made on the present facts and without prejudice to a subsequent motion raising the same request if circumstances change or new facts are learned. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 09/21/2021. (jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
notice ~Notice (other) Mon 07/20 8:39 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at[LINK:http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information] .****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/17 9:19 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Brief in Support filed by Elara Caring LLC.(Birrer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, July 10, 2020
25 25 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/10 4:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Brief in Support filed by Brooke Madden.(Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Jamie Caves,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Andrea Fairbanks,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Greg Otis,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Press Release Regarding Merger,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Madden Letter of Representation,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Counsel Correspondence
Monday, June 29, 2020
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/29 9:15 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re22 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Brief in Support . Responses due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 06/29/2020. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/26 1:55 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Brief in Support by Brooke Madden.(Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 12, 2020
22 22 motion Disqualify Counsel Fri 06/12 6:39 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Brief in Support by Elara Caring LLC.(Birrer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Johnson Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Madden Employment Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Caves Employment Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Park Nelson,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Caves LinkedIn
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 06/10 3:21 PM
ORDER denying as moot20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 06/10/2020. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
20 20 motion Strike Substitute Party Tue 06/09 4:29 PM
MOTION to Strike18 Joint Status Report , MOTION to Substitute Party by Brooke Madden. (Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Joint Status Report Tue 06/09 3:04 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT Amended by Plaintiff Brooke Madden. (Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Joint Status Report Tue 06/09 2:38 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Brooke Madden. (Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
17 17 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 05/29 12:57 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Chelsea G Glover on behalf of Elara Caring LLC (Glover, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
16 16 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 05/28 6:19 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Birrer on behalf of Elara Caring LLC (Birrer, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Docket Thu 05/28 3:50 PM
DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2020 10:40 AM telephonically before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 6/9/2020. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/15 9:42 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Glover shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before May 29, 2020, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/15/2020. (jb)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/15 9:41 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Birrer shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before May 29, 2020, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/15/2020. (jb)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Fri 05/15 9:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Birrer Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3154337 by Elara Caring LLC.(Hanna, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Request for Admission MB
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Fri 05/15 9:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chelsea Glover Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3154328 by Elara Caring LLC.(Hanna, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Request For Admissions
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 05/05 1:35 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Elara Caring LLC . (Hanna, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Mon 05/04 10:43 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Elara Caring LLC.(Hanna, Lauren)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 05/04 10:41 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren B Hanna on behalf of Elara Caring LLC (Hanna, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/10 4:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Elara Caring LLC. Elara Caring LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
6 6 service Summons Reissued - Alias Tue 02/11 3:41 PM
Summons Reissued Electronically - Alias as to Defendant Elara Caring LLC. (rb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 02/02 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke Madden. Elara Caring LLC served on 1/24/2020. (Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 01/22 3:14 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie M Caves on behalf of Brooke Madden (Caves, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
3 3 misc Receipt Mon 12/23 2:49 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Brooke Madden in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500077744 regarding1 Complaint. (ank)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 3:53 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Elara Caring LLC. (ank)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Elara Caring LLC filed by Brooke Madden.(ank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet