County of Kleberg v. CVS Health et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46159 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:19-cv-02815 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2020 12:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson
675-G Alpha Drive
Highland Heights, OH 44143 |
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Kleberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/07/2020 12:17 PM EST |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
32 | 32
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
![]() |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
37 | 37
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.] | ||
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
![]() |