Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:19-cr-00932
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2020 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Ivan Ayers (2)
Represented By
Heather L. Winslow
Attorney At Law
contact info
Eugene Charles O'Malley
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Tai Hon La (3)
Represented By
Richard H. McLeese
contact info
Defendant
Sedgwick Williams (1)
Represented By
Susan M. Pavlow
Law Offices Of Susan M. Pavlow
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info
Jared C. Jodrey
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Corey B. Rubenstein
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info

GPO Feb 12 2020
PROTECTIVE Order as to Sedgwick Williams, Ivan Ayers, Tai Hon La. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/12/2020.Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )PROTECTIVE Order as to Sedgwick Williams, Ivan Ayers, Tai Hon La. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/12/2020.Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )PROTECTIVE Order as to Sedgwick Williams, Ivan Ayers, Tai Hon La. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/12/2020.Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )

Docket last updated: 06/20/2024 10:47 AM CDT
Thursday, December 12, 2019
ARREST of defendant Sedgwick Williams. (jh, )
Related: [-]
ARREST of defendant Ivan Ayers. (jh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
ARREST of defendant Tai Hon La. (jh, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Sedgwick Williams (1), Ivan Ayers (2), Tai Hon La (3) (bg, )
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Sedgwick Williams: The matter is set for a detention hearing on 12/17/19 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom #1843. Defendant ordered to appear and be transported by U.S. Marshals Service. Mailed notice. (dal, )
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Ivan Ayers: The matter is set for a detention hearing on 12/17/19 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom #1843. Defendant ordered to appear and be transported by U.S. Marshals Service. Mailed notice. (dal, )
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Tai Hon La: The matter is set for a detention hearing on 12/17/19 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom #1843. Defendant ordered to appear and be transported by U.S. Marshals Service. Mailed notice. (dal, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Sedgwick Williams: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant Sedgwick Williams appears in response to his arrest on 12/12/19. Defendant advised of the charges and penalties available under the law and informed of his rights. The Court finds defendant is unable to afford counsel. Enter order appointing Susan Pavlow as counsel for defendant. The Government orally moves that the defendant be kept in custody while the case is decided. The matter is set for a detention hearing on 12/17/19 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom #1843. Defendant shall remain in federal custody. The matter is further set for a preliminary hearing on 12/20/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1843. By no later than noon on 12/19/19, counsel for the defendant will inform the Court's deputy by e-mail (David_Lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they plan on proceeding with the preliminary hearing. Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Sedgwick Williams by Susan M. Pavlow. (jh, )
Related: [-]
9 9 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Sedgwick Williams. (SEALED) (jh, )
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Ivan Ayers: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant Ivan Ayers appears in response to his arrest on 12/12/19. Defendant advised of the charges and penalties available under the law and informed of his rights. The Court finds defendant is unable to afford counsel. Enter order appointing Eugene O'Malley as counsel for defendant. The Government orally moves that the defendant be kept in custody while the case is decided. The matter is set for a detention hearing on 12/17/19 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom #1843. Defendant shall remain in federal custody. The matter is further set for a preliminary hearing on 12/20/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1843. By no later than noon on 12/19/19, counsel for the defendant will inform the Court's deputy by e-mail (David_Lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they plan on proceeding with the preliminary hearing. Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]
12 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Ivan Ayers by Eugene Charles O'Malley. (jh, )
Related: [-]
13 13 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Ivan Ayers. (SEALED) (jh, )
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Tai Hon La: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant Tai Hon La appears in response to his arrest on 12/12/19. Defendant advised of the charges and penalties available under the law and informed of his rights. The Court finds defendant is unable to afford counsel. Enter order appointing Richard McLeese as counsel for defendant. The Government orally moves that the defendant be kept in custody while the case is decided. The matter is set for a detention hearing on 12/17/19 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom #1843. Defendant shall remain in federal custody. The matter is further set for a preliminary hearing on 12/20/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1843. By no later than noon on 12/19/19, counsel for the defendant will inform the Court's deputy by e-mail (David_Lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they plan on proceeding with the preliminary hearing. Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 12/13/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]
17 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Tai Hon La by Richard H. McLeese. (jh, )
Related: [-]
18 18 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Tai Hon La. (SEALED) (jh, )
Related: [-]