Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:20-cv-00226
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2020
Terminated:Dec 29, 2020
Last checked: Monday Jul 13, 2020 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Schottenstein Property Group, Inc.
4300 E. Fifth Ave.
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
Janay Marie Stevens
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Jacklyn Judeen Ford
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Defendant
Schottenstein Property Group, LLC
4300 E. Fifth Ave.
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
Janay Marie Stevens
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Jacklyn Judeen Ford
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian Simpkins
address redacted
Represented By
Cheryl L Jennings
Thomas & Company, L.P.A.
contact info
Vincent P. Zuccaro
contact info
Scott William McKinley
Ohio Nurses Association
contact info
William R Thomas
Thomas & Company, L.P.A.
contact info
Michael J. Anthony
Anthony Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. P. P.
1457 S. High St.
Columbus, OH 43207
Represented By
Carrie J. Dyer
Mansell Law LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/29 9:30 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (daf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
36 36 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/28 5:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11/13 2:38 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Extension of Time of Case Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/13/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines Fri 11/13 2:40 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/2/2021. Primary Expert due by 1/11/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/4/2021. (daf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
34 34 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/12 1:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/11/2021. for Expert Deadlines by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
33 33 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/25 4:44 PM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that The third parties to whom Mr. Simpkins's six subpoenas are directed shall not produce responsive documents to anyone absent further order of the Court or written agreement of Plaintiff and Mr. Simpkins. Also Mr. Simpkins shall serve a copy of this Order on all six of the subpoena recipients as soon as possible. Finally plaintiff and Mr. Simpkins shall continue to meet and confer regarding the subpoenas and, if they reach impasse, shall confer on dates/times they are available for an informal discovery conference and contact chambers to request such a conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/25/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/17 9:15 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion for an Extension to the Case Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/17/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines Mon 08/17 9:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/29/2020. Dispositive motions due by 2/4/2021. Primary Expert due by 11/12/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/6/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
31 31 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/12 10:49 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/12/2020. (Primary Experts); 12/6/2020 Related [+]; 12/29/2020 (Discovery); 4/4/2021 (Dispositive Motions) by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-] buttal Experts
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, July 30, 2020
30 30 25 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 07/30 2:10 PM
ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint filed by Brian Simpkins. (Zuccaro, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
29 29 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Fri 07/24 1:08 PM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in September 2020 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 8/3/2020 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
28 28 21 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 07/23 4:09 PM
ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint filed by Schottenstein Property Group, Inc., Schottenstein Property Group, LLC. (Stevens, Janay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
27 27 20 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/09 9:37 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Schottenstein Property Group, Inc., Schottenstein Property Group, LLC, Brian Simpkins, filed by A. P. P.. (agm)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 07/09 9:36 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/9/2020. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Fri 06/12 4:33 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct (Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit Exh. A - Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 24 pgs Exhibit Exh. B - SPG Discovery Responses,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C - APP Counsel letter to SPG,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit Exh. D - SPG Investigation Report
Thursday, May 14, 2020
24 24 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 05/14 11:33 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/14/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
23 23 2 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/13 8:13 AM
Joint MOTION to Adopt Agreed Protective Order by Defendants Schottenstein Property Group, Inc., Schottenstein Property Group, LLC. (Stevens, Janay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 23, 2020
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 04/23 3:08 PM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Leave to File to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/23/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
21 21 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Tue 04/21 4:41 PM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in June 2020 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the Court is 5/1/2020. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/14 4:40 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Anonymously filed by Defendant Brian Simpkins. (Zuccaro, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/07 1:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Anonymously filed by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
utility Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines Mon 03/30 8:33 AM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Initial Disclosures due by 4/10/2020. (agm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 28, 2020
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Sat 03/28 2:00 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to file initial disclosures by 4/10/2020. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/28/2020. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
17 17 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/27 4:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/10/2020. For Initial Disclosures by Defendant Brian Simpkins. (Thomas, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/26 3:18 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Brian Simpkins Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Thomas, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/25 2:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Anonymously by Defendant Brian Simpkins. (Thomas, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Simpkins
Monday, March 02, 2020
14 14 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 03/02 12:47 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The March 6, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2020. Motions to Amend due by 6/15/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2020. Primary Expert due by 8/14/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/7/2020. Settlement Demand due by 4/15/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/15/2020. Mediation Deadline: 6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/2/2020. (daf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 02/28 11:25 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/13 10:01 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/13/2020. (kk2)
Related: [-]
motion File Document Under Seal Thu 02/13 10:03 AM
Sealed access was granted by the Court to permit counsel to file documents containing the full name of plaintiff, or information that identifies her directly or indirectly, under seal (kk2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal Thu 02/13 10:05 AM
The Clerk's Office has provided sealed access to counsel to file documents containing the full name of plaintiff, or information that identifies her directly or indirectly, under seal pursuant to the 2/13/2020 Order granting leave to proceed anonymously (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/12 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please Note:The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 3:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Schottenstein Property Group, Inc.. (Stevens, Janay)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 3:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Schottenstein Property Group, LLC. (Stevens, Janay)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 2:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Schottenstein Property Group, Inc., Schottenstein Property Group, LLC. (Stevens, Janay)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 9:27 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Brian Simpkins. (Thomas, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/29 3:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Plaintiff A. P. P.. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Schottenstein Property Group, Inc., Schottenstein Property Group, LLC, and Brian Simpkins. (daf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/15 2:30 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Brian Simpkins) (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/15 2:30 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Schottenstein Property Group, LLC) (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/15 2:29 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Schottenstein Property Group, Inc.) (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Schottenstein Property Group, Inc., Schottenstein Property Group, LLC, Brian Simpkins ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7282266), filed by A. P. P.. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Exh. A - Civil Cover Sheet