Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50029
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Apr 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Allura Imports, Inc.
1407 Broadway Suite 401
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Allura Imports, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 03, 2021
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/03 2:31 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50029 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/26 10:55 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50029 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
17 17 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/23 12:48 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Related [+] Signed on 4/23/2021 (RC)
Related: [-] ument(s)15 ,16
Thursday, April 22, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 04/22 5:11 PM
Certificate of No Objection re: Plaintiffs Fourth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
15 15 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 04/01 5:29 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Plaintiffs Fourth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/15/2021. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
14 14 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Fri 03/19 10:11 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 05/18/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
13 13 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 02/10 12:57 PM
Notice of Mediation / Notice of Mediation Scheduled for March 25, 2021 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Sunday, December 13, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/14 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, December 11, 2020
11 11 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/11 2:05 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 6/11/2021. Signed on 12/11/2020. (ATo)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 12/11 10:22 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Service Mon 06/22 7:26 AM
Notice of Service Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/07 4:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Allura Imports, Inc. Mediation due date: 09/4/2020.(Hehn, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 19, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/19 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 02/26 2:39 PM
Notice of Hearing // Re-Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants Election as to Procedures Order Track Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/11/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 4 4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4 ,4
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 02/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Approve // Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 3/10/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/07 1:02 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Allura Imports, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/7/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 01/21 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50029 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9608237, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/21 12:08 PM
Adversary case 20-50029 Complaint by George L. Miller against Allura Imports, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives