Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Referred: Beth Deere
Case #: 4:20-cv-00078
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Defendant
Antonio D Johnson Jr
Defendant
M Taylor
Plaintiff
Kane Derrick Millsaps

GPO Feb 01 2021
ORDER granting 39 motion to dismiss; dismissing Plaintiff's claims with prejudice; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/1/2021. (jbh)
GPO Feb 01 2021
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 41 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/1/2021. (jbh)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, July 01, 2021
misc Docket Note Tue 07/13 3:03 PM
Docket Note: Filing Fee paid in full on this date. (kth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
45 45 order Order on Motion for Order Thu 03/11 3:25 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying43 Motion for Order. Based on the Defendant's response, the Plaintiff has received the relief he requested. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/11/2021. (amr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
44 44 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/10 1:38 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re43 MOTION for Order filed by Antonio D Johnson, Jr, M Taylor.(Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 04, 2021
43 43 1 pgs motion Order Thu 03/04 2:49 PM
LETTER/MOTION for Order by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
42 42 order Judgment 1983 Mon 02/01 3:30 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the41 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/1/2021. (jbh)
Related: [-]
41 41 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/01 3:26 PM
ORDER granting39 motion to dismiss; dismissing Plaintiff's claims with prejudice; and instructing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/1/2021. (jbh)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/01 12:11 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re39 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Antonio D Johnson, Jr, M Taylor. (Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
39 39 motion Dismiss Mon 01/25 4:10 PM
MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss with Prejudice by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Copies Thu 12/03 3:12 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Copies; and directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Millsaps a copy of his31 motion for summary judgment and his32 declaration in support of his motion, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/3/2020. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
37 37 motion Copies Wed 12/02 3:20 PM
MOTION for Copies by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Take Deposition Thu 09/17 1:24 PM
ORDER denying35 Motion to Take Deposition from Kane Derrick Millsaps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/17/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Take Deposition Thu 09/17 11:41 AM
MOTION to Depose Plaintiff by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 09/03 2:08 PM
ORDER denying as premature31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/3/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
33 33 respm Response to Motion Mon 08/31 12:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
32 32 misc Declaration Mon 08/17 4:12 PM
DECLARATION by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (kdr)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Mon 08/17 4:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (kdr)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 08/17 11:46 AM
ORDER granting29 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines filed by M Taylor, Antonio D Johnson, Jr. The deadlines will be reset. The parties may continue to engage in discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/17/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
29 29 motion Stay Tue 08/11 1:39 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum Brief in Support by All Defendants (Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/27 4:42 PM
LETTER to the Judge by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Thu 07/16 1:04 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice26 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/16/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
26 26 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 07/15 4:10 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 05/19 2:14 PM
ORDER denying23 motion for summary judgment, without prejudice, as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/19/2020. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
24 24 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Wed 05/06 12:32 PM
DECLARATION in Support of23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (ljb)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Wed 05/06 12:30 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 04/15 10:06 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/15/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/15 9:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery is opened until 8/14/2020. Any party seeking summary judgment on the merits must file a motion no later than 8/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/15/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2020
20 20 discov Request for Production of Documents Thu 04/09 2:10 PM
REQUEST for Production of Documents by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 04/09 2:00 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
18 18 respoth Response (Non Motion) Thu 04/09 1:57 PM
RESPONSE to10 Answer to Complaint and15 Answer to Amended Complaint by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/07 8:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. M Taylor served on 2/10/2020. (fjg)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/07 8:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Antonio D Johnson, Jr served on 2/10/2020. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/13 1:59 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Antonio D Johnson, Jr, M Taylor.(Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 03/13 10:39 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/13/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
13 13 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 03/12 1:19 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
12 12 notice Consent Notice Wed 03/04 10:12 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (csf)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/04 10:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendants intend to pursue a defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit, it must be raised by motion for summary judgment no later than April 3, 2020. Discovery is stayed until further Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/4/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/02 3:13 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Antonio D Johnson, Jr, M Taylor.(Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/02 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Phillip Adkins on behalf of Antonio D Johnson, Jr, M Taylor (Adkins, Reid)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/28 1:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 02/05 10:26 AM
ORDER granting6 motion to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Varner Unit; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for Lieutenant Antonio D. Johnson Jr. and Corporal M. Taylor; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve each Defendant with a copy of the2 Complaint, with attachments, and a summons, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/5/2020. (jbh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Antonio D Johnson, Jr, M Taylor and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/04 2:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 01/29 2:39 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/29/2020. (csf)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 01/29 12:55 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/24 1:28 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying1 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application, along with a copy of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay a $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 01/24/2020. (ajt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (ljb)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/22 9:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kane Derrick Millsaps. (ljb)
Related: [-]