Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:20-op-45046
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2020
Case in other court:Virginia Western, 6:19-cv-00077
Last checked: Monday Mar 09, 2020 10:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By
Sarah Byer Miller
Bass, Berry & Sims
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Peter John Raupp
Steptoe & Johnson
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228
Represented By
Peter John Raupp
Steptoe & Johnson
contact info
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Jon Myer Talotta
Hogan Lovells
contact info
Rebecca C. Mandel
Hogan Lovells Us - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
Represented By
Turner A. Broughton
Williams Mullen
contact info
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By
Turner A. Broughton
Williams Mullen
contact info
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Represented By
Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By
Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By
Patrick Alan Harvey
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Represented By
Patrick Alan Harvey
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
Represented By
Patrick Alan Harvey
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Alan Harvey
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Washington
contact info
Defendant
MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC
Represented By
Jon Myer Talotta
Hogan Lovells
contact info
Rebecca C. Mandel
Hogan Lovells Us - Washington
contact info
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Represented By
Sarah Byer Miller
Bass, Berry & Sims
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
James Kevin Fee
Morgan, Lewis, Bockius
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By
Turner A. Broughton
Williams Mullen
contact info
Defendant
Virginia CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
James Kevin Fee
Morgan, Lewis, Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
James Kevin Fee
Morgan, Lewis, Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
James Kevin Fee
Morgan, Lewis, Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
James Kevin Fee
Morgan, Lewis, Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Justin Michael Sizemore
Reed Smith
contact info
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By
Wells Huntington Byrnes
Byrnes Gould
contact info
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By
Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Christian And Barton
contact info
Michael Willis Smith
Christian And Barton
contact info
Samuel Perry Coburn
Christian And Barton
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Munro Scott
Hirschler Fleischer
contact info
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
Represented By
Paul C. Kuhnel
Woods, Rogers & Hazlegrove
contact info
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
Represented By
Paul C. Kuhnel
Woods, Rogers & Hazlegrove
contact info
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By
Paul C. Kuhnel
Woods, Rogers & Hazlegrove
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-100
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By
Emily Munro Scott
Hirschler Fleischer
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By
Emily Munro Scott
Hirschler Fleischer
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
Represented By
Patrick Alan Harvey
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Washington
contact info
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Munro Scott
Hirschler Fleischer
contact info
Plaintiff
Amherst County, Virginia
Represented By
Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
Lauren Tallent Rogers
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
William Edgar Spivey
Kaufman & Canoles
contact info
Grant Edward Morris
Sanford Heisler
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
David Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
John Stewart
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Mark Timney
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Craig Landau
Terminated: 01/30/2020
Defendant
Russell Gasdia
Terminated: 01/30/2020


Docket last updated: 03/09/2020 10:41 AM EDT
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Amherst County Circuit Court, Case Number CL19-000828-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt No. 0423-3269754), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Caremark RX, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., and OptumRx, Inc.(ca) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - First Wave Opioid Cases,
Att: 2 178 pgs Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint, Cover Letters, Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Waivers,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet - with attachment listing counsel
2 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc. for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. (al) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (al) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc. (al) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc. for Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. (al)[Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
11 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
12 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark RX, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
14 14 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, L.L.C. for Caremark, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
15 15 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Amherst County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/18/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
17 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan, N.V., Corporate Parent Mylan, Inc. for Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Cheryl Mandel on behalf of Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
19 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Supplemental Notice of Removal)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
21 21 Joint MOTION for an Order Memorializing Parties' Agreement Regarding Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC.(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
22 22 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, L.L.C. for CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
23 23 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
24 24 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
25 25 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER granting21 Motion for an Order Memorializing Parties' Agreement Regarding Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/20/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
27 27 Paper State Court Records received from Amherst County Circuit Court, CL19000828-00, (Paper records available for viewing in the Roanoke Clerk's Office.) (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
28 28 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
29 29 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Amherst County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
30 30 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (addressing Supplemental Notice of Removal) by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
31 31 MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) Regarding Plaintiff's Motions to Remand and Defendants' Forthcoming Motion to Stay by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc..(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
32 32 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the JPML's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc..(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
33 33 Brief / Memorandum in Support re32 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the JPML's Final Transfer Decision . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc..(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-122,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Wave 1 and 2 Stay Orders,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Federal Officer Removed Cases,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - All Federal Officer Stays,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Diversity Removed Cases,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - NY Fraudulent Misjoinder Cases,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Federal Question Removed Cases,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - CAFA Removed Cases,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - CAFA Stay Orders,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Board of Commissioners Opinion,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Commonwealth of Kentucky
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
34 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Alan Harvey on behalf of Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. (Harvey, Patrick) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
35 35 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corp. for Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Harvey, Patrick) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
36 36 ORDER granting31 Motion Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
37 37 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re30 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (addressing Supplemental Notice of Removal) . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
38 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION to Remand to State Court, (and Incorporated Memorandum in Support) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.(Scott, Emily) Modified docket text on 1/13/2020 to reflect correct filing event at filer's request. (ca) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Federal Officer Removed Cases,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Diversity Removed Cases,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Amherst Cahill Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Work (DOD Contract),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - List of Opioid Cases,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
39 39 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc..(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
40 40 Brief / Memorandum in Support re39 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
41 41 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re32 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the JPML's Final Transfer Decision . filed by Amherst County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, January 17, 2020
42 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re30 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (addressing Supplemental Notice of Removal) . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
43 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum in Support . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
44 44 Reply Memorandum in Support of Moving Defendants' Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc..(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Federal Officer Cases,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Judge Polster Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Martinsville Stay Order
Friday, January 24, 2020
45 45 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re39 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) . filed by Amherst County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
46 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amherst County, Virginia (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
47 47 ORDER granting32 Motion to Stay Case. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether these cases will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/30/2020. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
48 48 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 2/5/2020.]
Related: [-]
49 49 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 6:19-cv-00077. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]