Lincoln County v. Sackler et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45069 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-02953 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2020 12:32 PM EDT |
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Missouri CVS LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumRx Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Health Group, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DepoMed Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lincoln County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/03/2020 3:48 PM EST |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD) [Transferred from moed on 2/11/2020.] | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 2/11/2020.] | |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 Docket Text ORDER Re:14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/27/2019. (AFC) [Transferred from moed on 2/11/2020.] | |
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |