Scholl et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED OUT.
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80269 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-03044 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 22, 2020 8:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Dahl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Hoag
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Scholl
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Wed 04/14 10:56 AM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/13/2021. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-80269-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Fri 04/09 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ryan Dahl, Brad Hoag, John Scholl. Attorney Robert Cecil Gilbert added to party Ryan Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Cecil Gilbert added to party Brad Hoag(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Cecil Gilbert added to party John Scholl(pty:pla). (Gilbert, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 02/24 2:16 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
16 | 16
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 02/24 2:15 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 02/24 2:02 PM
Case transferred in from Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-03044. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes). |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (kt) | |
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A Sabnis on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) | |
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER on9 Stipulation. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/30/2019. (JLB) | |
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Sanofi is a corporate parent of Defendants Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Sanofi is a corporate parent of Defendants Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Sanofi is a corporate parent of Defendants Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Dapper, Ruth) | |
10 | 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Stipulation. (Dapper, Ruth) | |
9 | 9 STIPULATION by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Jointly Signed by John Scholl, Ryan Dahl, and Brad Hoag. (Dapper, Ruth) | |
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick Howard for Ryan Dahl, Brad Hoag and for John Scholl.; granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Simon Bahne Paris for Ryan Dahl, Brad Hoag and for John Scholl. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/16/2019. (JGK) | |
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Simon Bahne Paris. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7335787 filed by Ryan Dahl, Brad Hoag, John Scholl. (Williams, Amanda) | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Howard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7335777 filed by Ryan Dahl, Brad Hoag, John Scholl. (Williams, Amanda) | |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Scholl, Brad Hoag, Ryan Dahl. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Chattem, Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Sanofi US Services Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Williams, Amanda) | |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mary M. Nikolai, Simon B. Paris, Patrick Howard as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (lmb) | |
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-3044 (PJS/LIB). (lmb) | |
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7322217) filed by John Scholl, Brad Hoag, Ryan Dahl. Filer requests summons issued. (Williams, Amanda) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |