Campu v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80278 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 2:19-cv-02380 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 23, 2020 6:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Campu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/19 2:28 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. The above-style case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. The above-reference case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Pretrial Order
Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
22 | 22
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 02/25 1:14 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
21 | 21
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 02/25 12:28 PM
Case transferred in from California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02380. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
20 | 20 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Florida. Electronic Records Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) | |
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
19 | 19 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/29/2020 GRANTING18 Application as to Attorney Joseph G. Petrosinelli, PHV, to represent Pfizer, Inc. (York, M) | |
PAYMENT for18 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8697802. (Raber, Stephen) | ||
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
18 | 18 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Pfizer, Inc. for attorney Joseph G. Petrosinelli to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Raber, Stephen added. (Filing fee $ 225)(Raber, Stephen) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
PAYMENT for18 Pro Hac Vice Application (Raber, Stephen) | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
17 | 17 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/2/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) | |
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
16 | 16 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller GRANTING Defendant's Proposed Substitution of Attorney (ECF No.14 ). Attorney Mark A. Sentenac is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in place of Attorney Lindsey C. Barnhart. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) | |
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Kas-Osoka, Oluoma) (Docket Text Modified on 1/23/2020 by H. Kaminski, and on 1/24/2020 by C. Schultz) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties stipulation (ECF No.12 ) and good cause appearing, defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings (ECF No.4 ) is hereby SUBMITTED for decision on the briefs on file. The hearing set for January 17, 2020 is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Souvannarath, A) | |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Waiver of Oral Argument on Defendants'5 Motion to Stay by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.,(Barnhart, Lindsey) Modified on 1/14/2020 (Benson, A.). | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11 REPLY by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., in support of4 Motion to Stay.(Barnhart, Lindsey) Modified on 1/14/2020 (Benson, A.). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 OPPOSITION by Gary Campu to4 Motion to Stay. (Moore, Jennifer) | |
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (Kas-Osoka, Oluoma) | |
8 | 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Kas-Osoka, Oluoma) | |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/12/2019: Having considered Defendants'5 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time, the court GRANTS Defendants' Application and ORDERS that Defendants respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 1/22/2020. (TEXT ONLY) (Michel, G.) | |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
5 | 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc..(Barnhart, Lindsey) Modified on 12/11/2019 (Kaminski, H). | |
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 MOTION to STAY by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.. Attorney Barnhart, Lindsey Catherine added. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Barnhart, Lindsey) Modified on 12/11/2019 (Kaminski, H). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Benson, A.) | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jennifer Ann Moore* *Moore Law Group, PLLC* *1473 S. 4th St., 4th Street* *Louisville, KY 40208*. (Benson, A.) | |
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Gary Campu. Attorney Moore, Jennifer Ann added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8589667)(Moore, Jennifer) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |