COGGINS et al v. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80286 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-20060 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 23, 2020 6:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Coggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra R. Weeks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/19 2:28 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. The above-style case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. The above-reference case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 03/02 3:31 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:19-cv-20060 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80286-RLR on 2/25/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Pretrial Order
Tue 02/25 3:55 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 02/25 3:53 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 02/25 3:44 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20060. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SHANKAR DURAISWAMY terminated. Attorney ERIC FRANCIS GLADBACH for BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. added..(GLADBACH, ERIC) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying all proceedings pending decision in MDL No. 2924; All deadlines are vacated; Parties shall notify the Court of the JMPL's decision within 10 days. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/15/2020. (abr) | |
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DURAISWAMY, SHANKAR) | |
Set Deadlines as to7 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings . Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) | ||
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE COGGINS, SANDRA R. WEEKS. CHATTEM, INC. served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (KING, BRADLEY) | |
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE COGGINS, SANDRA R. WEEKS. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (KING, BRADLEY) | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE COGGINS, SANDRA R. WEEKS. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (KING, BRADLEY) | |
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHELLE COGGINS, SANDRA R. WEEKS. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (KING, BRADLEY) | |
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) | ||
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10101228) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Michelle Coggins, Sandra R. Weeks.(KING, BRADLEY) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |