Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-01419
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2020
Case in other court:New Jersey, 3:20-cv-01367
Last checked: Sunday Aug 23, 2020 5:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
JOHN MICHAEL FIETKIEWICZ
Arnold & Porter
contact info
Eric Gordon Lasker
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James Collins
Represented By
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/14 2:47 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 306: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MONSANTO'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT MILLER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria. Associated cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC; 3:18-cv-01428-VC; 3:20-cv-00024-VC; 3:20-cv-00621-VC; 3:20-cv-01419-VC; 3:20-cv-02404-VC; 3:20-cv-03363-VC; 3:20-cv-08851-VC; 3:21-cv-00172-VC; 3:21-cv-00175-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 10/18 2:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 11/1/2024 MOTION HEARINGS. The Court will schedule hearings on an as-needed basis. Parties will be notified which motions will be heard on which day via the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 10/11 6:33 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byMonsanto Company. (Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-] 19 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF THOMAS MILLER
Monday, September 30, 2024
22 22 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 09/30 1:40 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byJames M. Collins.(Juliano, Anthony) Modified on 9/30/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 19 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF THOMAS MILLER
Att: 1 Attorney Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Miller Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Miller CV,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Miller Dep Excerpts
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/25 1:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 9/26/2024 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY HEARINGS TO 11/1/2024. Motion Hearings set for 11/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. MDL Docket Nos.: 18951, 18952,18953,18954, 18955, 18956, 18957,18958, 18959, 18960, 18961, 18963, 18969, 18970, 18971, 18972, 18973, 18974, 18976, 18982, 18985, 18988, 18990, 18991, 18992, 18993, 18994, 18995, 19041, 19043, 19046. 19047, 19048, 19049, 19051, 19062. Associated cases: 3:16-cv-05786-VC - Harris v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:17-cv-03448-VC - Setzer et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:17-cv-05084-VC - Cryan v. Monsanto Company, 3:18-cv-01428-VC - Berenfeld v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-03014-VC - Holliday v. Monsanto Company, Inc., 3:19-cv-03786-VC - Putzrath et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05238-VC - Casale v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05310-VC - Rowland et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05345-VC - Eilmes et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05598-VC - Rhuland et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05600-VC - Hayden et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05957-VC - Haase et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-06407-VC - Huntley v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-06423-VC - Gordon v. Monsanto Company et al,, 3:19-cv-07858-VC - Vander Groef et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-08064-VC - Gannon v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00057-VC - Bodie v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00056-VC - Beisner v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00027-VC - Wistinghausen et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00024-VC - Glassman et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00248-VC - Fallon et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00621-VC - Belfleur et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-01419-VC - Collins v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:20-cv-02419-VC - Finnell v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-02404-VC - Iona v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-02650-VC - Doran v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03363-VC - Holmes v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03433-VC - Aldoupolis et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03444-VC - Hutchison v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03720-VC - Coressel v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-04654-VC - Booth v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-04758-VC - Williams v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-04834-VC - COLTON v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al, 3:20-cv-05871-VC - Tudal et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-05888-VC - Gonzalez Lopez v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-05870-VC - Rubin et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-06194-VC - Romano v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-07219-VC - McDermott v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08053-VC - Skonicki v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08173-VC - Pinheiro v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:20-cv-08167-VC - Drons v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08518-VC - Daulton v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08801-VC - Penalver v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08851-VC - Thompson et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08847-VC - Fox v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-00041-VC - Pinheiro v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-00172-VC - Proctor et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-00175-VC - Kay et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-00675-VC - BOATRIGHT v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al, 3:21-cv-02550-VC - Perillo v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-02705-VC - Dominique v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-02908-VC - Stackhouse v. Monsanto Company, Inc., 3:21-cv-03297-VC - Rodgers v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-05398-VC - Hayes et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-05621-VC - Perry v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-05971-VC - Fleischhauer et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-06562-VC - Agosta v. Monsanto Company, Inc., 3:21-cv-07124-VC - Abel et al v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-09937-VC - El-Hakam et al v. Monsanto Company, Inc. et al, 3:22-cv-00092-VC - Sullivan v. Monsanto Company, 3:22-cv-00358-VC - Ginkel v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:22-cv-05287-VC - Sorrell et al v. Monsanto Company. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/23 5:50 PM
ORDER RE WAVE 7 DAUBERT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/09 2:21 PM
MOTION EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF THOMAS MILLER filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/30/2024. Replies due by 9/12/2024.(Marshall, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Linda C. Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (2024-05-10-Thomas Miller Deposition Collins excerpts),
Att: 3 Exhibit B ((Kay) 2024-05-16-Thomas A Miller Deposition excerpts),
Att: 4 Exhibit C (2024-02-20 Collins - Expert Report of Thomas Miller excerpts),
Att: 5 Exhibit D (2024-01-12 Kay - FINAL Expert Report of Thomas Miller (Kay v. Monsanto) excerpts),
Att: 6 Exhibit E (Exposure Assessment Tools by Routes - Dermal _ US EPA)
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/09 11:49 AM
MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert Conry, M.D. and for Summary Judgment filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/30/2024. Replies due by 9/12/2024.(Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Deposition,
Att: 6 Errata 5 Deposition,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Deposition,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Deposition,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 Deposition,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 Deposition,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 Deposition,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 Deposition,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 Expert Report,
Att: 14 Errata 13 Expert Report,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 Expert Report,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 Expert Report,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 Expert Report,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 Expert Report,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 Expert Report,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 Expert Report,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 Expert Report,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 Expert Report,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 Expert Report,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 Expert Report,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 Expert Report
Thursday, May 30, 2024
17 17 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/30 1:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff James Collins et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/30 1:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff James Collins et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/30 1:32 PM
Answer to14 Amended Complaint [RE: Plaintiff James Collins et al.] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) Modified on 5/30/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
14 14 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/22 11:12 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by James M. Collins. (Juliano, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Tue 05/21 3:46 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (18356) Motion to Substitute Party. James M. Collins added. James Collins terminated in case 3:16-md-02741-VC; granting (12) Motion to Substitute Party. James M. Collins added. James Collins terminated in case 3:20-cv-01419-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 motion Substitute Party Mon 05/13 8:42 AM
MOTION to Substitute Party due to death of plaintiff filed by James Collins. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/11/2024. Replies due by 6/18/2024.(Juliano, Anthony) Modified on 5/13/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/28 1:52 PM
NOTICE by James Collins Notice of Service of Expert Disclosures (Juliano, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/28 3:05 PM
Order Granting Motions to Move Cases to Later Waves. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/28/2023. Re: Dkt. 16989 , 16997 , 17010 , 17019 , 17022 , 17023 , 17024 , 17044 (crblc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
9 9 motion Transfer Case Mon 07/17 10:59 AM
Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to Wave VII (C) filed by James Collins. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2023 01:00 PM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 7/27/2023. Replies due by 8/3/2023.(Juliano, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 06, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/06 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Juliano (Juliano, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 8:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Gordon Lasker (Lasker, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 02/25 4:38 PM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-01367. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 2:34 PM
Order of MDL Panel (CTO-189) transferring case to the USDC for the CAND. (dm )
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 02/25 4:39 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of New Jersey, 3:20-cv-01367-AET-TJB, Collins v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3 20-01419 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 189 cc: JPMDL. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
4 4 Defendant Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MONSANTO COMPANY.(FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/11/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MONSANTO COMPANY identifying BAYER AG as Corporate Parent. (abr)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MONSANTO COMPANY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY LAW DIVISION: SOMERSET COUNTY, case number SOM-L174619. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW041952), filed by MONSANTO COMPANY.(abr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Receipt