NEARY v. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80294 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-20484 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
FRANCIS NEARY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Wed 04/14 8:38 AM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/13/2021. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-80294-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Fri 04/09 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by FRANCIS NEARY. Attorney Robert Cecil Gilbert added to party FRANCIS NEARY(pty:pla). (Gilbert, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pretrial Order
Wed 02/26 10:45 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 02/26 10:44 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 02/26 10:41 AM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20484. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) | ||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Service Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10122155) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FRANCIS NEARY.(ALBERT, LEE) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |