BOEKHOLT v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80300 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-20649 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JASON BOEKHOLT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Thu 02/03 3:52 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/3/2022. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-80300-RLR See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 10/18 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by JASON BOEKHOLT (Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 11/04 5:10 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JASON BOEKHOLT.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 08/21 11:43 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT Per PTO 31 against All Defendants, filed by JASON BOEKHOLT.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pretrial Order
Wed 02/26 12:21 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 02/26 12:18 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 02/26 12:14 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20649. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) | |
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) | ||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10134361) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JASON BOEKHOLT.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |