PINKNEY v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80301 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-20650 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 7:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
WARNER PINKNEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Wed 04/20 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by WARNER PINKNEY (Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 23, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 08/23 3:07 PM
Second MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (DISMISSALS INCLUDED AS TO DEFENDANT PIFZER) against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, SANOFI S.A, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc, filed by WARNER PINKNEY.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 11/09 3:22 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by WARNER PINKNEY.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Saturday, August 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Sat 08/22 12:08 AM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Per PTO 31 against All Defendants, filed by WARNER PINKNEY.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pretrial Order
Wed 02/26 12:35 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 02/26 12:34 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 02/26 12:31 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20650. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) | ||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10134378) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WARNER PINKNEY.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |