MOLINA v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80306 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-20910 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 7:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
William Molina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/19 2:28 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. The above-style case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. The above-reference case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 02/26 1:35 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:19-cv-20910 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80306-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 02/26 1:31 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 02/26 1:27 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20910. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CHATTEM INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10146937) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM MOLINA.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) |