BICE, JR. v. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80308 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-21142 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 7:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 09/26 2:52 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (jmd) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 07/29 11:54 AM
Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form for Steven Bice Jr. against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem Inc., GlaskoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline P L C, Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 04/05 6:01 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 03/31 5:07 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 23, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 08/23 5:53 PM
Second MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (DISMISSALS INCLUDED AS TO SANOFI AND PFIZER) against Boehringer Ingelahm Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem Inc., GMBH, GlaskoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline P L C, Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, filed by STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 11/04 4:40 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 08/21 10:43 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT Per PTO 31 against Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Administrative Order
Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 02/26 2:25 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 02/26 2:20 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-21142. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel(CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
1 | 1 53 pgs COMPLAINT against CHATTEM INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10162963) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Steven Wayne Bice, Jr..(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Pre-Suit Notice Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) |