BAKER v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80325 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-21512 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 25, 2020 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
George Baker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 09/26 2:52 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (jmd) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 04/13 6:10 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Baker.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 08/23 5:55 PM
Second MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (DISMISSALS INCLUDED AS TO BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM, SANOFI AND PFIZER) against Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, filed by George Baker.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Thu 11/05 9:42 AM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Baker.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Saturday, August 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Sat 08/22 12:26 AM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Per PTO 31 against All Defendants, filed by George Baker.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Mon 03/02 8:07 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pretrial Order
Thu 02/27 2:55 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 02/27 2:54 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:19-cv-21512 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80325-RLR on 2/27/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 02/27 2:45 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 02/27 2:43 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-21512. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel(CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, PFIZER, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) | |
1 | 1 46 pgs COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, PFIZER, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10189077) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEORGE BAKER.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) |