JOHNSON v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80339 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:20-cv-00117 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 26, 2020 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 06/16 2:49 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT short form complaint against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Johnson.(Beck, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
utility
~Util - Terminate Attorneys
Tue 06/15 10:19 AM
Attorney James E. Cecchi representing Johnson, Brenda (Plaintiff); Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Johnson, Brenda (Plaintiff) terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to James Cecchi. PER DE#10 (cds) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel - aty
Mon 06/14 1:58 PM
NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Kimberly Beck on behalf of Brenda Johnson instead of prior counsel of record Robert Hilliard, James Cecchi. . Attorney Kimberly Beck added to party Brenda Johnson(pty:pla). (Beck, Kimberly) |
|
Saturday, August 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Sat 08/22 1:40 AM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Per PTO 31 against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Johnson.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 02/28 5:01 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Fri 02/28 4:59 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-00117 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80339-RLR on 2/28/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 02/28 4:51 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Fri 02/28 4:49 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-00117. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10221525) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRENDA JOHNSON.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) |