LOUBRIEL v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80341 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:20-cv-00131 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 26, 2020 4:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
CRISTINA LOUBRIEL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/21 9:31 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Robert C. Hilliard representing LOUBRIEL, CRISTINA (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. CRISTINA LOUBRIEL may obtain new counsel and ensure that new counsel files a notice of appearance on behalf of CRISTINA LOUBRIEL within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/13 2:55 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by CRISTINA LOUBRIEL. Responses due by 4/27/2022(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 11/06 3:14 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CRISTINA LOUBRIEL.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Fri 10/30 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re10 MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,9 MDL Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with PTOs 15, 23 & 38 filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . Attorney Mark S. Cheffo added to party GlaxoSmithKline LLC(pty:dft). (Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/28 8:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,9 MDL Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with PTOs 15, 23 & 38 by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Saturday, August 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Sat 08/22 12:07 AM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Per PTO 31 against All Defendants, filed by CRISTINA LOUBRIEL.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 02/28 5:21 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Fri 02/28 5:18 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-00131 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80341-RLR on 2/28/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 02/28 5:15 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Fri 02/28 5:12 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-00131. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10221845) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CRISTINA LOUBRIEL.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) |