LINSON v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80348 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-21525 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 29, 2020 7:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
MONICA LINSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Thu 02/03 3:49 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/3/2022. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-CV-80348-RLR See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Tue 09/21 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MONICA LINSON. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party MONICA LINSON(pty:pla). (Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 03/02 1:00 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 03/02 12:59 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:19-cv-21525 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80348-RLR on 3/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/02 12:56 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/02 12:54 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-21525. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, PFIZER, INC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) | |
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) | ||
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, PFIZER, INC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10189412) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MONICA LINSON.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |