Howell Franklin v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80349 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:19-cv-09666 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 29, 2020 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Howell Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Fri 08/20 5:04 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/20/2021. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:20-cv-80349-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 08/09 8:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Howell Franklin (Wisner, Robert) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/24 11:48 AM
NOTICE by Howell Franklin Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Moore, Jennifer) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Attorneys
Thu 09/24 1:31 PM
Attorney Jennifer A. Moore representing Franklin, Howell (Plaintiff) terminated. Per DE#34. (cqs) |
||
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 08/21 8:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint Pursuant to Amended PTO 31 against All Defendants, filed by Howell Franklin.(Maldonado, Nicole) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 08/21 7:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole K.H. Maldonado on behalf of Howell Franklin. Attorney Nicole K.H. Maldonado added to party Howell Franklin(pty:pla). (Maldonado, Nicole) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 08/21 7:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Brent Wisner on behalf of Howell Franklin. Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party Howell Franklin(pty:pla). (Wisner, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 03/11 10:19 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Central District of California. Case Number 2:19-cv-09666 with documents 1-26. Assigned FLSD Case Number 2:19-cv-09666 on 3/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-cv-80349-RLR. (mc) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/02 1:56 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
27 | 27
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/02 1:53 PM
Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-09666. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
26 | 26 Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically on 2/24/20. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) | |
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
25 | 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) | |
24 | 24 STATUS REPORT Joint Stipulation Regarding Case Status filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (O'Neill, Amy) | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy L O'Neill on behalf of Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attorney Amy L O'Neill added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft))(O'Neill, Amy) | |
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Substitute attorney Mark Sentenac in place of attorney Lindsey Barnhart for Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.21 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) | |
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
21 | 21 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Mark Sentenac in place of attorney Lindsey Barnhart filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY15 AS UNOPPOSED by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The matter will be stayed pending decision by the Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation. Parties are ordered to file a joint stipulation every 30 days as to the status of the matter. (lc) | |
19 | 19 The hearing on the MOTION TO STAY CASE15 , scheduled for January 6, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY | |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation 15 filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Sanofi US Services Inc as Corporate Parent. (Huynh, Tommy) | |
16 | 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc. identifying Sanofi US Services Inc as Corporate Parent. (Huynh, Tommy) | |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., identifying Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation and Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. (Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
13 | 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020; Chattem, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020; GlaxoSmithKline, LLC answer now due 1/8/2020; Pfizer, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020; Sanofi US Services Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020, filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Attorney Lindsey C Barnhart added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barnhart, Lindsey) | |
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) | |
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09666 ODW(KSx). (rn) | |
10 | 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. (et) | |
Att: 1 Summons for Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for Defendant Chattem Inc, | ||
Att: 3 Summons for Defendant Pfizer Inc, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC | ||
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Howell Franklin.(Moore, Jennifer) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Howell Franklin, (Moore, Jennifer) | |
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) | |
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Howell Franklin.(Moore, Jennifer) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Howell Franklin. (Moore, Jennifer) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24759614 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Howell Franklin. (Attorney Jennifer A Moore added to party Howell Franklin(pty:pla))(Moore, Jennifer) |