CHASE v. SANOFI SA et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80352 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Florida Northern, 1:19-cv-00329 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 29, 2020 7:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JOAN CHASE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Wed 06/08 3:35 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASE. Case is Deconsolidated from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case remains closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Tue 05/24 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to All Defendants by JOAN CHASE (Longer, Frederick) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 11/18 9:11 AM
Plaintiff's MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by JOAN CHASE.(Longer, Frederick) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Mon 11/02 7:12 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re12 MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, Branded Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Joan Chase's Complaint For Failure To Comply With Pretrial Orders # 15, # 23, and # 38 filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Chattem Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Agneshwar, Anand) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/28 8:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, Branded Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Joan Chase's Complaint For Failure To Comply With Pretrial Orders # 15, # 23, and # 38 by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Attorney Anand Agneshwar added to party Chattem Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anand Agneshwar added to party Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anand Agneshwar added to party Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Agneshwar, Anand) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 03/02 4:05 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 03/02 4:03 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Northern District of Florida. Case Number 1:19-cv-00329 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80352-RLR on 3/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/02 3:52 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/02 3:49 PM
Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00329. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) re MDL 2924 to Southern District of Florida (atm) | |
Att: 1 email request | ||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER GRANTING STAY. The matter is stayed pending the determination of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in In re Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2924. ECF No. 4 signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/15/20. (bkp) | |
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (COHEN, JORDAN) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC, CHATTEM INC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, SANOFI SA, SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (atm) | |
Att: 1 summons chattem, | ||
Att: 2 summons gsk, | ||
Att: 3 summons sanofi sa, | ||
Att: 4 summons sanofi us, | ||
Att: 5 summons sanofi av | ||
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (atm) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC, CHATTEM INC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI S.A., SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4751177.), filed by JOAN CHASE. (NIGH, DANIEL) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., | ||
Att: 3 Summons - CHATTEM, INC., | ||
Att: 4 Summons - GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons - SANOFI S.A., | ||
Att: 6 Summons - SANOFI US SERVICES INC., | ||
Att: 7 Summons - SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC |