BELL v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80354 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:20-cv-00039 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 29, 2020 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
LENA MARIE BELL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 11/09 5:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LENA MARIE BELL.(Hilliard, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 03/02 4:33 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 03/02 4:32 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-00039 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80354-RLR on 3/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/02 4:29 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/02 4:26 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-00039. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) | |
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) | |
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) | ||
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10218387) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LENA MARIE BELL.(CECCHI, JAMES) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: NOS should be 367 - Healthcare/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) |