Baker v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80381 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Northern, 1:20-cv-00175 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 01, 2020 6:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Baker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Wed 09/27 3:29 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Friday, May 07, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 05/07 4:21 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Braxton Washburn.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 03/19 9:44 AM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Baker.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Thu 03/11 2:07 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Braxton Washburn.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 12/30 10:44 AM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Braxton Washburn.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 12/18 11:38 AM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Baker.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 12/18 11:35 AM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Braxton Washburn.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
Thursday, November 26, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Thu 11/26 3:55 AM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short-Form Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Robert Baker, Braxton Washburn.(Herberth, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Master Personal Injury Complaint | ||
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Administrative Order
Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Pretrial Order
Thu 03/05 10:17 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 03/05 10:16 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Northern District of Ohio. Case Number 1:20-cv-00175 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80381-RLR on 3/5/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
7 | 7
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 03/05 10:12 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 03/05 10:09 AM
Case transferred in from Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00175. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2924 Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the Southern District of Florida and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (P,R) | |
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 3/30/2020 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/12/20. (D,Ma) | |
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC., Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc. (Y,A) | |
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
2 | 2 Request to Clerk for service upon All Defendants by certified. filed by Robert Baker. Related document(s)1 .(Herberth, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
1 | 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9745627. Filed by Robert Baker. (Herberth, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A) | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A) |